LA HR30 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a task force to study the funding and workload of judicial districts and circuits (EN +$300,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Establishes a task force to study the funding and workload of judicial districts and circuits (EN +$300,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House Vote on HR 30 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#765) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-29 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |