LA HR3 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates October 2020 as National Chiropractic Health Month in Louisiana
Title
Designates October 2020 as National Chiropractic Health Month in Louisiana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-10-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |
2020-10-01 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |