LA HR28 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the House Committee on Judiciary to study how to mitigate the long term consequences of eviction records and rent debt on renters and this economy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the House Committee on Judiciary to study how to mitigate the long term consequences of eviction records and rent debt on renters and this economy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on HR 28 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#208) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-22HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-21HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2020-10-21HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-10-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-10-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/21/20.
2020-10-20HouseRead by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-20HouseDischarged from the Committee on Judiciary.
2020-10-19HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback