LA HR278 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study road conditions on particular highways that intersect with United States Highway 61 in St. John the Baptist Parish
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study road conditions on particular highways that intersect with United States Highway 61 in St. John the Baptist Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HR 278 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1621) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2024-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-29 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-05-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |