LA HR208 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that copies of proposed floor amendments be placed on a member's desk absent a request by the member
Title
Removes requirement that copies of proposed floor amendments be placed on a member's desk absent a request by the member
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HR 208 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#947) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 12. The resolution was adopted. |
2019-06-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |