LA HR2 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the United States Congress to enact reforms to federal permitting policies to accelerate deployment of new energy infrastructure
Title
Urges and requests the United States Congress to enact reforms to federal permitting policies to accelerate deployment of new energy infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2024-03-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |