LA HR188 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to repurpose certain congressional earmarked funds for the planning, design, and construction of widening and improving of certain portions of Louisiana Highway 30
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to repurpose certain congressional earmarked funds for the planning, design, and construction of widening and improving of certain portions of Louisiana Highway 30
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HR 188 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1245) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2016-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-31 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2016-05-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-05-24 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |