LA HR185 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the La. Department of Health to report to certain legislative committees data relating to Medicaid estate recovery cases
Title
Authorizes and directs the La. Department of Health to report to certain legislative committees data relating to Medicaid estate recovery cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Vote on HR 185 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1163) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 16. The resolution was adopted. |
2021-06-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2021. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |