LA HR181 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Tuesday, May 24, 2016, as Suicide Prevention Day in the state
Title
Designates Tuesday, May 24, 2016, as Suicide Prevention Day in the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-05-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |