LA HR160 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Azariya McClendon upon her graduation from both high school and college on May 13, 2016
Title
Commends Azariya McClendon upon her graduation from both high school and college on May 13, 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |