LA HR15 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Saturday, March 12, 2016, as Sigma Gamma Rho Sorority Youth Day
Title
Recognizes Saturday, March 12, 2016, as Sigma Gamma Rho Sorority Youth Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-02-26 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |