LA HR135 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the commissioner of administration to prepare a reconciliation of the Comprehensive Annual Financial Report with certain other year-end financial reports
Title
Requests the commissioner of administration to prepare a reconciliation of the Comprehensive Annual Financial Report with certain other year-end financial reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on HR 135 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#636) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2017-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |