LA HR133 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education take all necessary actions to provide that no measure of student growth be used in the evaluation of teachers for the 2020-2021 school year
Title
Requests that the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education take all necessary actions to provide that no measure of student growth be used in the evaluation of teachers for the 2020-2021 school year
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HR 133 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#865) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2021-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |