LA HR101 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to study the role of ACT and WorkKeys scores in the school and district accountability system
Title
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to study the role of ACT and WorkKeys scores in the school and district accountability system
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Turner [R] | Rep. Beryl Amedee [R] | Rep. Kim Carver [R] | Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R] |
Rep. Charles Owen [R] | Rep. Phillip Tarver [R] | Rep. Sylvia Taylor [D] | Rep. Rashid Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - House - House Vote on HR 101 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1018) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-14 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2024-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024. |
2024-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |