LA HCSR8 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to state retirement systems, requests the House and Senate committees on retirement to study issues related to board membership and system investments
Title
Relative to state retirement systems, requests the House and Senate committees on retirement to study issues related to board membership and system investments
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Tucker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-21 | Approved on 6/21/10. | |
2010-06-17 | Study request list distributed to the members on 6/17/10. | |
2010-06-17 | Request study by the committee on Retirement. | |
2010-06-17 | Received by the Senate Office on 6/17/10. | |
2010-06-17 | Sent to the Senate. | |
2010-06-15 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received on 6/14/2010. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HCSR8 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=716794 |