LA HCSR11 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the House and Senate committees on insurance to study termination or cancellation of health and accident insurance coverage by insurers and health maintenance organizations
Title
Requests the House and Senate committees on insurance to study termination or cancellation of health and accident insurance coverage by insurers and health maintenance organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-21 | Approved on 6/21/10. | |
2010-06-17 | Study request list distributed to the members on 6/17/10. | |
2010-06-17 | Request study by the committee on Insurance. | |
2010-06-17 | Received by the Senate Office on 6/17/10. | |
2010-06-17 | Sent to the Senate. | |
2010-06-15 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received on 6/14/2010. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HCSR11 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=716850 |