LA HCSR10 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the House Committee on Civil Law and Procedure and the Senate Committee on Judiciary A to study notice of liens under the Private Works Act
Title
Requests the House Committee on Civil Law and Procedure and the Senate Committee on Judiciary A to study notice of liens under the Private Works Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-21 | Approved on 6/21/10. | |
2010-06-17 | Study request list distributed to the members on 6/17/10. | |
2010-06-17 | Request study by the committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-06-17 | Received by the Senate Office on 6/17/10. | |
2010-06-17 | Sent to the Senate. | |
2010-06-15 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received on 6/14/2010. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HCSR10 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=716849 |