LA HCR99 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests Louisiana State University and the office of state fire marshal to work collaboratively to enhance firefighter training
Title
Requests Louisiana State University and the office of state fire marshal to work collaboratively to enhance firefighter training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 99 CONCUR (#1012) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 99 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#710) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 99 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#710) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 101, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. |
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-24 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Commerce. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |