LA HCR94 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Holden High School girls' softball team on winning the 2018 LHSAA Class B state championship
Title
Commends the Holden High School girls' softball team on winning the 2018 LHSAA Class B state championship
Sponsors
Rep. Sherman Mack [R] | Sen. Valarie Hodges [R] | Sen. Rogers Pope [R] | Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R] |
Sen. Dale Erdey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 94 ADOPT (#887) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |