LA HCR91 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the board of directors of the Louisiana School Boards Association
Title
Commends the board of directors of the Louisiana School Boards Association
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Brass [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 91 CONCUR (#392) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-04-27 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |