LA HCR90 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force to study and evaluate the effectiveness of sexual health education programs used throughout the state and other states
Title
Creates a task force to study and evaluate the effectiveness of sexual health education programs used throughout the state and other states
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 90 CONCUR (#823) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 90 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#463) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 90 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#463) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2013. |
2013-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. |
2013-05-08 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-04-29 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |