LA HCR9 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions of administrative rules to require vapor recovery systems at certain facilities along the Mississippi River in certain parishes
Title
Amends provisions of administrative rules to require vapor recovery systems at certain facilities along the Mississippi River in certain parishes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |