LA HCR9 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-21-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-21-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to support the Social Security Fairness Act
Title
Memorializes Congress to support the Social Security Fairness Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 9 ADOPT (#330) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 9 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#178) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 9 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#178) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-27 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2020-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |