LA HCR89 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HCR52
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the management regime for the Southern Hills Aquifer System
Title
Provides relative to the management regime for the Southern Hills Aquifer System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 89 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#620) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-28 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014. |
2014-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-21 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HCR No. 52 reported by the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment (13-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HCR52 (Replaces) 2014-04-21 - Becomes HCR 89.