LA HCR89 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Tuesday, April 30, 2013, as AKA Day at the state capitol
Title
Recognizes Tuesday, April 30, 2013, as AKA Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 89 ADOPT (#212) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-04-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |