LA HCR87 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the courts to develop and implement a unified court cost system
Title
Requests the courts to develop and implement a unified court cost system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 87 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1200) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 87 CONCUR (#854) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 87 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#845) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 87 CONCUR (#854) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 87 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#845) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-25 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/26/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 89, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-05 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |