LA HCR86 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a study group to make recommendations concerning the prospective establishment of an independent health professions scope of practice review committee
Title
Creates a study group to make recommendations concerning the prospective establishment of an independent health professions scope of practice review committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#680) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-10 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016. |
2016-05-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2016-04-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |