LA HCR81 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Dept. of Health and Hospitals to submit a report to the House and Senate committees on health and welfare evaluating the health benefits and healthcare costs of adding adrenoleukodystrophy to the mandatory screenings to be performed on a newborn child
Title
Directs the Dept. of Health and Hospitals to submit a report to the House and Senate committees on health and welfare evaluating the health benefits and healthcare costs of adding adrenoleukodystrophy to the mandatory screenings to be performed on a newborn child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 81 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1015) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 81 ADOPT (#970) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House Vote on HCR 81 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#651) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 81 ADOPT (#970) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House Vote on HCR 81 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#651) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2014. |
2014-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 88, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2014. |
2014-04-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-23 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2014-04-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-04-14 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |