LA HCR72 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and Requests the chairmen of the House Committee on Ways and Means and the Senate Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs to establish a joint subcommittee to study state tax incentives and rebates (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Urges and Requests the chairmen of the House Committee on Ways and Means and the Senate Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs to establish a joint subcommittee to study state tax incentives and rebates (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Romero [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 72 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#986) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2022-04-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |