LA HCR69 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests establishment of credentials for commercial driver's license classroom training
Title
Requests establishment of credentials for commercial driver's license classroom training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 69 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1232) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 69 CONCUR (#891) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 69 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#540) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 69 CONCUR (#891) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 69 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#540) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022. |
2022-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2022-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |