LA HCR67 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To request the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to study the possibility of state reciprocity in the issuance of hunting and fishing licenses for certain former members of the U.S. Armed Forces
Title
To request the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to study the possibility of state reciprocity in the issuance of hunting and fishing licenses for certain former members of the U.S. Armed Forces
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 67 ADOPT (#904) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 67 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#859) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 67 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#859) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-05 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/17. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2017-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |