LA HCR62 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Delhi Charter School powerlifting team
Title
Commends the Delhi Charter School powerlifting team
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 62 CONCUR (#222) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-04-13 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |