LA HCR62 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries and the Department of Agriculture and Forestry to evaluate feral hog toxicants and seek opportunities to cooperate
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries and the Department of Agriculture and Forestry to evaluate feral hog toxicants and seek opportunities to cooperate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 62 ADOPT (#774) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Vote on HCR 62 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#497) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Vote on HCR 62 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#497) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-30 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |