LA HCR60 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a joint subcommittee of the House Appropriations Committee and Senate Finance Committee to research, evaluate, and make recommendations relative to the office of technology services (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requests a joint subcommittee of the House Appropriations Committee and Senate Finance Committee to research, evaluate, and make recommendations relative to the office of technology services (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 60 CONCUR (#1063) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 60 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#974) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HCR 60 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#974) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-19 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |