LA HCR6 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Calls for a convention to amend the United States Constitution to establish a limitation on terms for members of congress

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calls for a convention to amend the United States Constitution to establish a limitation on terms for members of congress

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 6 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#37) (Y: 67 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-06-22SenateReported favorably.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2020-06-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-16HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 67, nays 18. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20.
2020-06-11HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-10HouseReported favorably (10-0-1).
2020-06-04HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback