LA HCR58 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests an evaluation and report concerning prospective implementation of a "baby box" program as a means of reducing infant mortality
Title
Requests an evaluation and report concerning prospective implementation of a "baby box" program as a means of reducing infant mortality
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 58 ADOPT (#779) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 58 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#533) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 58 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#533) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/17. |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |