LA HCR55 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Representative Frank A. Hoffmann for his pro-life leadership
Title
Commends Representative Frank A. Hoffmann for his pro-life leadership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 55 BY WALSWORTH ADOPT (#265) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |