LA HCR51 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Board of Ethics to work with the office of facility planning and control to determine the potential costs and feasibility of installing audio-video equipment in the board's meeting room to record, archive, and broadcast board meetings
Title
Requests the Board of Ethics to work with the office of facility planning and control to determine the potential costs and feasibility of installing audio-video equipment in the board's meeting room to record, archive, and broadcast board meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-04-08 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-05 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 8, 2010. | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-03-31 | Reported favorably (14-0). | |
2010-03-30 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |