LA HCR47 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urges and requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study a possible change or increase in penalties for drivers who injure or kill pedestrians or cyclists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges and requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study a possible change or increase in penalties for drivers who injure or kill pedestrians or cyclists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 47 ADOPT (#700) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HCR 47 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#419) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2019-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-01SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2019-05-27SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-30HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback