LA HCR43 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Edward McNeill, Jr., of New Orleans
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Edward McNeill, Jr., of New Orleans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 43 ADOPT (#416) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |