LA HCR3 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-27-1)
Status: Passed on October 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Memorializes congress and the Louisiana congressional delegation to take such actions as are necessary to require the Federal Emergency Management Agency to grant Louisiana full federal funding for disaster expenses associated with Hurricane Laura or to grant Louisiana the ability to utilize alternative sources of federal funds as any needed match if full funding is not provided

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorializes congress and the Louisiana congressional delegation to take such actions as are necessary to require the Federal Emergency Management Agency to grant Louisiana full federal funding for disaster expenses associated with Hurricane Laura or to grant Louisiana the ability to utilize alternative sources of federal funds as any needed match if full funding is not provided

Sponsors

Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]
Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]
Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]
Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Les Farnum [R]Rep. Gabe Firment [R]
Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]
Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]
Rep. John Illg [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]
Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]
Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]
Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]
Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Joseph Orgeron [R]
Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]
Rep. Troy Romero [R]Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]
Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Phillip Tarver [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]
Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]
Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 3 ADOPT (#108) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#6) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-10-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-14HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-10-14SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2020-10-12SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2020-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-10-02HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2020-09-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
2020-09-30HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-09-29HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback