LA HCR3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 49, nays 45. The resolution was rejected.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 49, nays 45. The resolution was rejected.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Louisiana Economic Development rules relative to local approval for the Industrial Ad Valorem Tax Exemption Program (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Amends Louisiana Economic Development rules relative to local approval for the Industrial Ad Valorem Tax Exemption Program (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#611) (Y: 48 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#611) (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#425) (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#611) (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#425) (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 49, nays 45. The resolution was rejected. |
2019-05-28 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2019-05-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-23 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2019-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 50, nays 44. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2019-05-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19. |
2019-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-15 | House | Notice removed |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19. |
2019-05-14 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-14 | House | Notice removed |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. |
2019-05-08 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-08 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19. |
2019-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (8-7). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |