LA HCR3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 49, nays 45. The resolution was rejected.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amends Louisiana Economic Development rules relative to local approval for the Industrial Ad Valorem Tax Exemption Program (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends Louisiana Economic Development rules relative to local approval for the Industrial Ad Valorem Tax Exemption Program (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#611) (Y: 48 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#611) (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#425) (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseRead by title, amended, roll called, yeas 49, nays 45. The resolution was rejected.
2019-05-28HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-05-28HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-23HouseNotice given.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2019-05-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 50, nays 44. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
2019-05-20HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-15HouseNotice given.
2019-05-15HouseNotice removed
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-14HouseNotice given.
2019-05-14HouseNotice removed
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-08HouseNotice given.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-30HouseReported with amendments (8-7).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HCR3&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121712
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128879
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128205
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128314
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128696
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129439
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132749
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132642
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134032
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134372
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135891
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121718
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128130
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131500
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132082
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135894
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138582
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140050

Bill Comments

feedback