LA HCR26 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the Bd. of Elementary and Secondary Education, in collaboration with the Dept. of Education, study issues relative to micro schools
Title
Requests that the Bd. of Elementary and Secondary Education, in collaboration with the Dept. of Education, study issues relative to micro schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on HCR 26 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#226) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 26 ADOPT (#160) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 26 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#82) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 26 ADOPT (#160) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 26 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#82) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-10-21 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-21 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-10-13 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-12 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2020-10-06 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |