LA HCR25 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Wednesday, April 19, 2017, as Louisiana A+ Schools Day at the state capitol
Title
Recognizes Wednesday, April 19, 2017, as Louisiana A+ Schools Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 25 ADOPT (#36) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-04-12 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-04-11 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |