LA HCR183 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Cecilia Metoyer Balthazar of Cane River
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Cecilia Metoyer Balthazar of Cane River
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 183 ADOPT (#995) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |