LA HCR182 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorates the fiftieth anniversary of the 1963 Birmingham church bombing in which four black girls were killed
Title
Commemorates the fiftieth anniversary of the 1963 Birmingham church bombing in which four black girls were killed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 182 ADOPT (#994) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |