LA HCR176 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Louise Williams of Weyanoke upon the celebration of her 110th birthday on June 15, 2010
Title
Commends Louise Williams of Weyanoke upon the celebration of her 110th birthday on June 15, 2010
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 176, ADOPT (#719) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-05-24 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-20 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-05-19 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-05-19 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |