LA HCR17 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on October 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on October 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to discuss possible adjustments to the Minimum Foundation Program formula in order to ensure adequate funding for school systems affected by Hurricane Laura or Hurricane Delta
Title
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to discuss possible adjustments to the Minimum Foundation Program formula in order to ensure adequate funding for school systems affected by Hurricane Laura or Hurricane Delta
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 17 ADOPT (#183) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 17 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#85) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 17 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#85) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-10-13 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-13 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-10-13 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-10-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-12 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2020-09-30 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |