LA HCR167 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends DEMCO upon the celebration of its seventy-fifth anniversary
Title
Commends DEMCO upon the celebration of its seventy-fifth anniversary
Sponsors
Sen. Rogers Pope [R] | Sen. Mack White [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 167 ADOPT (#799) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |